|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/12/1910 | 17/02/1911 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1914 | 19/12/1914 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1921 | 06/08/1921 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1923 | 03/03/1923 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6102 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1927 | 17/09/1927 | 134 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1936 | 08/02/1936 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1937 | 08/01/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 25 days | General | New right hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 102 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4823 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
09/12/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1910. Dep: 17/02/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
12/09/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1914. Dep: 19/12/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
09/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1921. Dep: 06/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
13/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
06/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
29/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6102 |
||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
27/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
26/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
07/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. | ||
17/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. | ||
12/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
18/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
26/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. | ||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938. | ||
04/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: New right hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1497 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1487 | ||
10/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1487 from Ardsley (ARD) |