|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/04/1911 | 08/07/1911 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1914 | 26/09/1914 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1919 | 22/11/1919 | 309 days | General | Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1921 | 04/06/1921 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1923 | 23/06/1923 | 127 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1924 | 29/11/1924 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6103 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1926 | 13/03/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1927 | 21/05/1927 | 134 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/1 Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1930 | 10/01/1931 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1933 | 11/11/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 31 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1943 | 10/07/1943 | 33 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 16Sup) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1103 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4824 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1911. Dep: 08/07/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
25/07/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1914. Dep: 26/09/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
18/01/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1919. Dep: 22/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
09/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921. | ||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. | ||
04/08/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1103C | ||
13/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6103 |
||
27/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
02/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
08/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/1 Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
08/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 10/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. | ||
21/09/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. | ||
16/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
08/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
23/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
26/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
15/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
12/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. | ||
29/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1498 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1488 | ||
16/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61488 but not taken up | ||
07/10/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1488 from Ardsley (ARD) |