|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/11/1907 | 14/12/1907 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1909 | 24/04/1909 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1912 | 29/06/1912 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1915 | 12/02/1916 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1920 | 13/11/1920 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1922 | 23/12/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 30/05/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6069 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 12/02/1927 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1930 | 01/11/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1932 | 14/01/1933 | 29 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 29 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 27 days | Light Repair | New left hand cylinder fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1680 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1069 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6237 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
09/11/1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1907. Dep: 14/12/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
06/03/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1909. Dep: 24/04/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
11/05/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1912. Dep: 29/06/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
04/12/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1915. Dep: 12/02/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
21/08/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1920. Dep: 13/11/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/09/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. | ||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6069 |
||
10/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
17/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
08/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. Work undertaken: New left hand cylinder fitted |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1302 but not taken up | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1680 |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
08/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
24/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61680 but not taken up | ||
13/11/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1680 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. | ||
01/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |