|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1910 | 29/01/1910 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1920 | 07/08/1920 | 211 days | General | Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1922 | 10/02/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 09/05/1925 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6072 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 17/12/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 43 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 36 days | General | 21in type 8K cylinders fitted Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1072 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6240 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
13/01/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1910. Dep: 29/01/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
10/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1920. Dep: 07/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 10/02/1923. | ||
19/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6072 |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927. | ||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
27/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
07/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. | ||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. Work undertaken: 21in type 8K cylinders fitted Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1304 but not taken up | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1682 | ||
14/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1682 from Mexborough (MEX) |