|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/01/1908 | 21/03/1908 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1911 | 27/05/1911 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1914 | 07/11/1914 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1919 | 27/03/1920 | 232 days | General | Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1922 | 10/06/1922 | 57 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 01/12/1923 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 185C |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5185 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 99 days | General | Superheated boiler & 21in type 8K cylinders fitted Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1932 | 13/02/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1936 | 16/01/1937 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 12 days | General | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1949 | 31/10/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 185 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4536 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1908. Dep: 21/03/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/03/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1911. Dep: 27/05/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/09/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1914. Dep: 07/11/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/08/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1919. Dep: 27/03/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1922. Dep: 10/06/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 185C |
||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
15/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
28/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5185 |
||
18/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler & 21in type 8K cylinders fitted Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
16/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
22/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
30/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1932. Dep: 13/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1310 but not taken up | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1688 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
07/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61688 but not taken up | ||
31/10/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1688 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
31/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 31/10/1949. |