Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5565 Week
» 7303 Month
» 134746 Year
» 1800122 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 52 m/e 03/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 52C   25/08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5052   06/02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1329   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1347   12/05/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B6
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B603/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1921
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1921
GOR   Gorton on 14/07/1922
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 10/02/1926
ARD   Ardsley on 07/02/1928
BFD   Bradford Hammerton Street on 13/05/1930
ARD   Ardsley on 10/09/1930
BFD   Bradford Hammerton Street on 29/12/1930
ARD   Ardsley on 14/04/1931
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 15/05/1934
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ARD   Ardsley on 04/08/1946
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN ARD Ardsley on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 58)
02/08/1930 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 873)
27/07/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
20/02/1937 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 2)
23/08/1941 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)
12/02/1944 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 3699)
03/08/1946 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 3700)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 24/04/1923 60 days General    
Gorton Works 11/08/1923 25/08/1923 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 52C
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1925 06/02/1926 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5052
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 07/01/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 02/08/1930 29 days General Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 15/07/1933 22 days General    
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 27/07/1935 15 days General Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 20/02/1937 22 days General New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 2 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1939 17/06/1939 22 days General    
Gorton Works 04/08/1941 23/08/1941 20 days General Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1944 12/02/1944 26 days General Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1946 03/08/1946 36 days General Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1947 14/06/1947 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 52
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 24/04/1923.    
11/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 52C
   
28/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5052
   
10/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928.    
07/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
   
10/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
29/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
14/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933.    
15/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 2 (Diagram 15B)
   
27/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.    
04/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
18/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 15B)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1329 but not taken up    
12/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1347    
29/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
   
04/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1347 from Ardsley (ARD)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.    

prev prev