Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 20 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1857 Week
» 13002 Month
» 112787 Year
» 1778163 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 72 m/e 05/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 72C   03/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5072   07/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1360   03/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61360   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/105/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1921
Withdrawal Fri 10/09/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1948 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/9/48 but sent via Dukinfield to Darlington and cut up 11/48

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1921
GOR   Gorton on 25/05/1921
IMM   Immingham on 26/06/1927
GOR   Gorton on 09/05/1929
WFD   Woodford Halse on 05/03/1937
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 20/10/1946
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 26/10/1946
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 10/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
18/06/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1921)
11/04/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 80)
01/04/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
13/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
16/05/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
17/07/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
17/12/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
28/09/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 784)
20/03/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 86)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 11/08/1923 03/11/1923 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 72C
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1925 07/11/1925 99 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5072
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 18/06/1927 71 days General Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 11/05/1929 57 days General    
Gorton Works 07/03/1931 11/04/1931 36 days General Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 01/04/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 13/10/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 16/05/1936 22 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1937 17/07/1937 29 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1938 17/12/1938 22 days General Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 28/09/1940 36 days General Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1943 20/03/1943 22 days General Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1945 04/08/1945 50 days General    
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 05/10/1946 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 25/01/1947 8 days Light Repair After collision
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 72
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/05/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 72C
   
01/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5072
   
09/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13)
   
26/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.    
09/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
   
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
05/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
26/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
   
27/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1360    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61360 but not taken up    
10/09/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1360 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
11/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev