Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 52 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4771 Week
» 15916 Month
» 115701 Year
» 1781077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 73 m/e 06/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 73C   17/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5073   14/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1361   21/08/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61361   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/106/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1921
Withdrawal Fri 04/03/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1921
GOR   Gorton on 25/06/1921
IMM   Immingham on 23/06/1931
GOR   Gorton on 09/08/1931
WFD   Woodford Halse on 22/01/1937
GOR   Gorton on 24/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 01/07/1945
     Withdrawn on 04/03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 04/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
04/06/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 160)
17/06/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
08/12/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
08/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 559)
19/03/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3021)
30/03/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3011)
13/02/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3037)
25/11/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3022)
14/06/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3037)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 01/09/1923 17/11/1923 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 73C
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1925 14/11/1925 106 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5073
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 04/06/1927 57 days General Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 20/04/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 06/06/1931 36 days General    
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 17/06/1933 36 days General Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1934 17/03/1934 29 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 17/11/1934 08/12/1934 22 days General Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 08/08/1936 29 days General Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1938 19/03/1938 22 days General Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 30/03/1940 36 days General Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1943 13/02/1943 33 days General Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1944 25/11/1944 22 days General Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1947 14/06/1947 43 days General Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 73
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/06/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 73C
   
01/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5073
   
09/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13)
   
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.    
23/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
   
17/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.    
17/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
   
22/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
26/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
   
12/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
   
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
   
01/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
21/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1361    
03/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61361 but not taken up    
04/03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1361 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
11/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev prev