|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/12/1923 | 01/03/1924 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5078 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1926 | 04/09/1926 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 07/07/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1936 | 15/02/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 78 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
30/07/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5078 |
||
08/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. | ||
28/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
20/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. | ||
25/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1362 | ||
26/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61362 but not taken up | ||
20/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1362 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |