Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 451 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4943 Week
» 29777 Month
» 64109 Year
» 1729485 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 78 m/e 07/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5078   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1362   15/09/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61362   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/107/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1921
Withdrawal Wed 20/04/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 23/4/49 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1921
GOR   Gorton on 30/07/1921
IMM   Immingham on 27/08/1932
GOR   Gorton on 20/10/1932
WFD   Woodford Halse on 20/02/1936
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 01/07/1945
     Withdrawn on 20/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 20/04/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 73)
04/09/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1927)
29/09/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
18/06/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 503)
15/02/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
03/07/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 763)
04/02/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
23/11/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 583)
12/06/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)
17/02/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
24/05/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3019)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/12/1923 01/03/1924 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5078
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1926 04/09/1926 120 days General Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1928 29/09/1928 113 days General Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 16/08/1930 43 days General    
Gorton Works 28/05/1932 18/06/1932 22 days General Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 07/07/1934 29 days General    
Gorton Works 25/01/1936 15/02/1936 22 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 03/07/1937 22 days General Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1939 04/02/1939 22 days General Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1940 23/11/1940 22 days General Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1943 12/06/1943 25 days General Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1945 17/02/1945 36 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1947 24/05/1947 29 days General Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 78
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5078
   
08/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13)
   
09/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
   
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.    
28/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13)
   
27/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.    
25/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
20/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
   
14/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
   
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
01/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1362    
26/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61362 but not taken up    
20/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1362 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev