|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5036 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1926 | 30/10/1926 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 27/10/1928 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1930 | 19/07/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1932 | 27/08/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 43 days | General | Four new cylinders fitted Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1943 | 19/02/1944 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1947 | 11/01/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 36 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3478 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
04/11/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/01/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5036 |
||
24/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
04/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13) |
||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930. | ||
06/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
24/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: Four new cylinders fitted Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 19/02/1944. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1363 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
21/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61363 but not taken up | ||
12/06/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1363 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
12/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. | ||
09/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |