Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 31 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2957 Week
» 4695 Month
» 132138 Year
» 1797514 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 37 m/e 10/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 37C   01/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5037   10/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1364   10/10/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61364   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3479
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Sat 12/06/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1948 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1921
NEA   Neasden on 04/11/1921
IMM   Immingham on 03/02/1922
WFD   Woodford Halse on 26/01/1923
ANN   Annesley on 19/07/1924
WFD   Woodford Halse on 22/11/1924
CLK   Colwick on 28/10/1925
GOR   Gorton on 07/04/1926
LIV   Brunswick on 11/08/1940
GOR   Gorton on 20/09/1940
ANN   Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
GOR   Gorton on 16/04/1947
     Withdrawn on 12/06/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton on 16/04/1947
WDN GOR Gorton on 12/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
11/06/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1923)
28/03/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
22/04/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 80)
12/01/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
11/01/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
19/02/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
13/01/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 6)
07/03/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
26/02/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3041)
03/08/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3039)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 06/10/1923 01/12/1923 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 37C
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1925 10/10/1925 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5037
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1927 11/06/1927 57 days General Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1929 11/05/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 28/03/1931 29 days General Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 22/04/1933 22 days General Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 12/01/1935 29 days General Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1935 11/01/1936 29 days General New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1938 19/02/1938 29 days General Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1939 13/01/1940 22 days General Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1941 26/04/1941 29 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1942 07/03/1942 27 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1944 26/02/1944 31 days General Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1946 03/08/1946 43 days General Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1948 12/06/1948 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 37
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3479
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
04/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 37C
   
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
11/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5037
   
28/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
   
30/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.    
28/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
   
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
   
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
   
14/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 11/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
22/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
   
23/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
   
11/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
20/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 13)
   
10/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1364    
16/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61364 but not taken up    
12/06/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1364 from Gorton (GOR)    
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.    
09/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev