Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 458 m/e 10/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 458C   03/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5458   22/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1366   20/07/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61366   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3481
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1921
NEA   Neasden on 18/11/1921
GOR   Gorton on 21/11/1924
NEA   Neasden on 03/09/1925
GOR   Gorton on 16/01/1926
CLK   Colwick on 09/02/1926
GOR   Gorton on 01/04/1926
WFD   Woodford Halse on 02/11/1942
ANN   Annesley on 24/05/1943
WFD   Woodford Halse on 21/06/1943
ANN   Annesley on 05/07/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 31/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1924)
22/11/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 556)
20/02/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1924)
04/02/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
21/03/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
18/06/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 559)
29/06/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
28/11/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
02/12/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
15/02/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3044)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 18/08/1923 03/11/1923 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 458C
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1924 22/11/1924 64 days General Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5458
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 29/08/1925 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 16/01/1926 78 days General    
Gorton Works 03/09/1927 29/10/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 25/08/1928 15 days Light Repair Re-tubing
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1929 02/11/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 20/02/1932 29 days General Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 04/02/1933 22 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 28/07/1934 29 days General    
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 21/03/1936 22 days General Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 18/06/1938 36 days General Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1940 29/06/1940 22 days General Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 25/01/1941 22 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1942 28/11/1942 59 days General Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1944 02/12/1944 22 days General Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 15/02/1947 29 days General Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 458
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3481
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
18/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 458C
   
20/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5458
   
21/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925.    
03/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 16/01/1926.    
16/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Re-tubing
   
21/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.    
23/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 20/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13)
   
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.    
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
   
08/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
01/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
   
02/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
   
20/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1366    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61366 but not taken up    
31/12/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1366 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev