Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1035 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2207 Week
» 21108 Month
» 21108 Year
» 1686484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 459 m/e 10/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 459C   19/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5459   13/02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1367   27/07/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61367   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61703   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3482
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1921
NEA Neasden on 25/11/1921
IMM Immingham on 20/02/1926
NEA Neasden on 18/07/1929
WFD Woodford Halse on 27/09/1941
GOR Gorton on 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 05/09/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1925)
25/02/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1924)
31/12/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1929)
20/01/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
05/10/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
04/09/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
26/08/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3025)
19/06/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3032)
21/04/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)
09/08/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/10/1923 19/01/1924 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 459C
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1925 13/02/1926 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5459
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 25/02/1928 78 days General
Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 12/04/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 21/11/1931 31/12/1931 41 days General
Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 31/01/1934 33 days General
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 05/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1937 04/09/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 26/08/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1942 14/03/1942 31 days General  
Gorton Works 22/05/1943 19/06/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1945 21/04/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1947 09/08/1947 57 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 459
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3482
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1367    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61367 but not taken up    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61703    
05/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61703 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev