|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/10/1923 | 19/01/1924 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 459C |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5459 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1933 | 31/01/1934 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1935 | 05/10/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 31 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 459 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3482 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
06/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 459C |
||
07/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5459 |
||
20/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
10/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
01/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. | ||
21/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 31/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. | ||
22/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1367 | ||
14/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61367 but not taken up | ||
07/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61703 | ||
05/09/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61703 from Gorton (GOR) |