Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 462 m/e 11/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5462   15/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1370   02/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61370   Not applied
British Railways (BR Tmp) E1370   17/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/111/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3485
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Fri 19/11/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 27 yrs , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1921
NEA   Neasden on 09/12/1921
WFD   Woodford Halse on 19/05/1922
GOR   Gorton on 05/06/1926
NEA   Neasden on 25/01/1927
WFD   Woodford Halse on 23/08/1928
NEA   Neasden on 14/09/1928
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/03/1929
NEA   Neasden on 11/10/1935
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 14/04/1938
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ANN   Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 24/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 19/11/1948
WDN   w/e 14/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
07/04/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1698)
11/07/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)
05/08/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 160)
17/08/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3006)
25/03/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
25/01/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)
15/08/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
25/11/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3044)
04/01/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
17/01/1948 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 01/12/1923 15/03/1924 106 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5462
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 29/05/1926 92 days General    
Gorton Works 18/02/1928 07/04/1928 50 days General Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 30/11/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 11/07/1931 29 days General Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 05/08/1933 22 days General Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 17/08/1935 22 days General Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 27/03/1937 43 days General New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1939 25/03/1939 15 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1940 25/01/1941 36 days General Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1942 15/08/1942 27 days General Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1944 25/11/1944 29 days General Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 04/01/1947 36 days General Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 17/01/1948 36 days Heavy After collision
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1370
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1948 19/11/1948 1 day No repairs    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 462
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3485
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
09/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
01/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1923. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5462
   
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 29/05/1926.    
05/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
   
23/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
14/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
14/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.    
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
   
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
   
11/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
14/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
11/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
   
20/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 13)
   
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1370    
30/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
   
13/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1370
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61370 but not taken up    
19/11/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1370 from Gorton (GOR)    
19/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/11/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948.    

prev prev