Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 3 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5534 Week
» 7272 Month
» 134715 Year
» 1800091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 464 m/e 11/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5464   26/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1372   21/07/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61372   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/111/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3487
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Fri 10/09/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1921
NEA   Neasden on 09/12/1921
WFD   Woodford Halse on 12/01/1923
ANN   Annesley on 05/09/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 20/10/1946
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 26/10/1946
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 10/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1930)
28/07/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
22/11/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
04/03/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
27/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
25/01/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
19/06/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 583)
26/10/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
30/01/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3026)
05/02/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3039)
22/06/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 26/04/1924 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5464
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 06/09/1924 36 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 03/04/1926 71 days General    
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 28/07/1928 92 days General Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1930 22/11/1930 36 days General Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 04/03/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 27/10/1934 15 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1935 25/01/1936 26 days General Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 19/06/1937 22 days General Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 18/03/1939 36 days General    
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 26/10/1940 22 days General Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1942 30/01/1943 50 days General Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1944 05/02/1944 25 days General Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1946 22/06/1946 43 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 464
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3487
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
09/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5464
   
02/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.    
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
   
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
   
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
31/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.    
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
   
12/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 13)
   
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1372    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61372 but not taken up    
09/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    
10/09/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1372 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev