Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 48 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 13030 Month
» 112815 Year
» 1778191 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 465 m/e 08/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5465   24/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1373   14/09/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61373   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/108/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1921
Withdrawal Thu 19/08/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 27 yrs , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/8/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1921
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 24/02/1922
GOR   Gorton on 24/05/1924
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 05/06/1924
GOR   Gorton on 10/02/1926
WFD   Woodford Halse on 11/10/1935
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 19/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 19/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
10/12/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
23/05/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1921)
17/06/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
02/03/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
31/10/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
29/10/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)
14/10/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3026)
01/03/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
24/04/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3022)
28/10/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3040)
31/05/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 24/05/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5465
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1926 10/07/1926 92 days General    
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 10/12/1927 57 days General Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1929 18/05/1929 50 days General    
Gorton Works 14/09/1929 19/10/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 23/05/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 17/06/1933 29 days General Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 02/03/1935 22 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 31/10/1936 22 days General Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1938 29/10/1938 22 days General Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1939 14/10/1939 50 days General New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 01/03/1941 29 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1943 24/04/1943 23 days General Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1944 28/10/1944 19 days General Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 15/09/1945 43 days General New inside cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1947 31/05/1947 36 days General Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 465
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5465
   
24/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
10/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926.    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
   
30/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929.    
14/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13)
   
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
   
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
11/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
   
08/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
   
26/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
   
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
02/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
   
14/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1373    
26/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61373 but not taken up    
19/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1373 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev