Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 901 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5528 Week
» 7266 Month
» 134709 Year
» 1800085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 466 m/e 10/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5466   05/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1374   15/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61374   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Sat 18/09/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1921
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 24/02/1922
NEA   Neasden on 09/09/1925
GOR   Gorton on 05/03/1929
NEA   Neasden on 30/03/1929
WFD   Woodford Halse on 09/02/1941
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 18/09/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 18/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 80)
02/03/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 73)
27/09/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 356)
16/07/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
26/05/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
04/04/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3001)
19/02/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3020)
06/07/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
08/11/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3024)
18/12/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3029)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 05/07/1924 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5466
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1926 04/12/1926 99 days General    
Gorton Works 05/01/1929 02/03/1929 57 days General Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1930 27/09/1930 50 days General Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 16/07/1932 29 days General Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 26/05/1934 43 days General Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 04/04/1936 29 days General Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1938 19/02/1938 29 days General Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 06/07/1940 22 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1941 08/11/1941 33 days General Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1941 17/01/1942 29 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1943 18/12/1943 24 days General Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1946 23/03/1946 57 days General    
Gorton Works 18/09/1948 18/09/1948 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 466
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5466
   
09/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
28/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1926. Dep: 04/12/1926.    
05/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13)
   
05/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
   
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
   
14/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
   
22/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
09/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
   
20/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13)
   
26/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946.    
15/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1374    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61374 but not taken up    
18/09/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1374 from Gorton (GOR)    
18/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.    

prev prev