|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5467 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1926 | 30/06/1926 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 29/06/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1931 | 30/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1933 | 04/02/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1935 | 30/03/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 36 days | Heavy | Four new cylinders fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 467 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
14/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5467 |
||
10/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 30/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
15/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. | ||
14/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929. | ||
16/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1375 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: Four new cylinders fitted |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61375 but not taken up | ||
30/04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61704 | ||
13/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61704 from Gorton (GOR) |