Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 58 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2984 Week
» 4722 Month
» 132165 Year
» 1797541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 467 m/e 02/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5467   15/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1375   28/09/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61375   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61704   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/102/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1922
Withdrawal Mon 13/06/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1922
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/07/1922
GOR   Gorton on 30/06/1926
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/09/1926
NEA   Neasden on 14/01/1928
IMM   Immingham on 16/07/1929
WFD   Woodford Halse on 03/05/1943
ANN   Annesley on 24/05/1943
WFD   Woodford Halse on 21/06/1943
ANN   Annesley on 05/07/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 13/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 160)
30/06/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1847)
30/05/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
04/02/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1926)
30/03/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
04/04/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
06/11/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)
20/05/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
26/04/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3026)
09/01/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3020)
09/06/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
01/03/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3018)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 15/03/1924 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5467
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1926 30/06/1926 82 days General Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 03/12/1927 50 days General    
Gorton Works 11/05/1929 29/06/1929 50 days General    
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 30/05/1931 36 days General Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 04/02/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1935 30/03/1935 22 days General Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 04/04/1936 22 days General Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1937 06/11/1937 22 days General Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1939 20/05/1939 29 days General Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1941 26/04/1941 36 days General Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1942 09/01/1943 36 days General Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1945 09/06/1945 36 days General Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 01/03/1947 43 days General Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1947 20/12/1947 36 days Heavy Four new cylinders fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 467
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5467
   
10/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 30/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
   
30/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/09/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.    
14/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.    
16/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
   
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13)
   
09/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
   
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
   
16/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
22/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
   
05/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
   
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
28/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1375    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
   
15/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61375 but not taken up    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61704    
13/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61704 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev