Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 31 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1868 Week
» 13013 Month
» 112798 Year
» 1778174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 468 m/e 03/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5468   12/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1376   21/09/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61376   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/103/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1922
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1922
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/07/1922
NEA   Neasden on 09/10/1935
WFD   Woodford Halse on 09/02/1941
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 31/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
01/09/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
14/11/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 576)
22/04/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
16/06/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 928)
30/10/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 6)
09/12/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3015)
15/08/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3021)
05/08/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
21/09/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3027)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 12/04/1924 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5468
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1926 25/09/1926 99 days General    
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 01/09/1928 120 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 17/05/1930 43 days General    
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 14/11/1931 29 days General Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 22/04/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 16/06/1934 64 days General Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 24/08/1935 29 days General    
Gorton Works 25/01/1936 28/03/1936 64 days Heavy Four new cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1937 30/10/1937 29 days General Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 09/12/1939 15 days General Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1942 15/08/1942 41 days General Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1943 04/09/1943 3 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 01/07/1944 05/08/1944 36 days General Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 29/09/1945 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 21/09/1946 29 days General Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1376
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 468
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5468
   
19/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1926. Dep: 25/09/1926.    
05/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
   
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
14/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.    
09/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
   
02/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
   
09/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
   
02/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
29/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.    
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1376
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61376 but not taken up    
31/12/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1376 from Gorton (GOR)    
01/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev prev