Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 13 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1923 Week
» 2862 Month
» 206352 Year
» 1871728 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 469 m/e 04/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5469   10/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1377   13/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61377   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61705   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/104/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1922
Withdrawal Mon 13/02/1950 off Sheffield Darnall (39B)
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1950 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/2/50

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1922
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/07/1922
IMM   Immingham on 10/05/1924
GOR   Gorton on 18/07/1929
NEA   Neasden on 03/05/1934
GOR   Gorton on 26/09/1934
ANN   Annesley on 31/10/1935
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 15/09/1946
     Withdrawn on 13/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 39B Sheffield Darnall on 13/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
21/04/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 292)
12/12/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 579)
07/10/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1847)
07/11/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
30/04/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
14/10/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)
11/01/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
26/09/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)
05/02/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3034)
06/10/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3028)
08/11/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3042)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 10/05/1924 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5469
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1926 10/04/1926 71 days General    
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 21/04/1928 57 days General Boiler number 292 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 01/03/1930 43 days G,    
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 01/11/1930 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 12/12/1931 29 days General Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 07/10/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 26/01/1935 36 days General    
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 17/08/1935 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 07/11/1936 22 days General Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 30/04/1938 36 days General Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 14/10/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 11/01/1941 43 days General Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1941 09/08/1941 10 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1942 26/09/1942 24 days General Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1944 05/02/1944 34 days General Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1945 06/10/1945 36 days General Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 21/12/1946 1 day Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1947 08/11/1947 29 days General Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 469
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5469
   
10/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926.    
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 292 (Diagram 13)
   
18/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/01/1930 Works Visit      
01/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.    
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
   
16/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
   
03/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
26/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 26/01/1935.    
10/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.    
31/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
   
26/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
   
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
   
31/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
03/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13)
   
01/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
   
15/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
13/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1377    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61377 but not taken up    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61705    
02/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    
13/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61705 from Sheffield Darnall (39B)    

prev prev