Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 34 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2832 Week
» 14514 Month
» 167467 Year
» 1832843 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 470 m/e 05/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5470   09/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1378   22/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61378   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/105/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1922
Withdrawal Thu 19/08/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 26 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1948 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/8/48 but cut up at Darlington 11/48

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1922
GOR   Gorton on 03/05/1922
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 21/04/1924
GOR   Gorton on 05/06/1924
CLK   Colwick on 04/03/1937
ANN   Annesley on 05/01/1938
GOR   Gorton on 06/11/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 15/09/1946
     Withdrawn on 19/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 19/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 273)
21/09/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 66)
08/04/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
25/08/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 784)
09/05/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
26/02/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
14/10/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3027)
23/08/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3029)
06/11/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3012)
24/11/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 583)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/10/1923 16/01/1924 82 days General    
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 13/03/1926 85 days General    
Gorton Works 24/09/1927 19/11/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 21/09/1929 57 days General Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 11/07/1931 29 days General    
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 08/04/1933 29 days General Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 25/08/1934 22 days General Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1936 09/05/1936 22 days General Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1938 26/02/1938 15 days General Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 14/10/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1941 23/08/1941 25 days General Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1943 06/11/1943 25 days General Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 24/11/1945 29 days General Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 18/01/1947 29 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 13/09/1947 1 day Light Repair    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 470
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
03/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 16/01/1924.    
09/02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5470    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
05/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 13/03/1926.    
24/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927.    
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
   
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.    
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
   
18/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
   
04/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 26/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
   
30/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13)
   
13/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
   
06/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
   
15/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1378    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
13/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947.    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61378 but not taken up    
19/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1378 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
11/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev