Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4625 Week
» 29459 Month
» 63791 Year
» 1729167 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 471 m/e 06/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5471   27/09/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1379   21/07/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61379   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/106/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1922
Withdrawal Sat 12/02/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1922
GOR   Gorton on 03/06/1922
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 21/04/1924
GOR   Gorton on 13/07/1924
ANN   Annesley on 10/02/1932
WFD   Woodford Halse on 01/01/1935
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 08/01/1938
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ANN   Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 13/11/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 15/09/1946
     Withdrawn on 12/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 12/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 274)
27/09/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
26/12/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 345)
18/11/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 45)
01/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3013)
08/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 86)
03/02/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3019)
26/09/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3001)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 09/08/1924 27/09/1924 50 days General Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5471
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1926 01/05/1926 71 days General    
Gorton Works 07/04/1928 02/06/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 22/02/1930 43 days General    
Gorton Works 08/11/1930 08/11/1930 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 21/11/1931 26/12/1931 36 days General Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1933 18/11/1933 29 days General Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1935 27/04/1935 22 days General    
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 01/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1937 08/01/1938 36 days General Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1939 03/02/1940 43 days General Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1942 26/09/1942 20 days General Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1943 13/11/1943 39 days Heavy Four new cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 13/04/1946 43 days General    
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 09/08/1947 50 days Heavy New inside cylinders fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 471
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
03/06/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
13/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5471
   
20/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 01/05/1926.    
07/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1928. Dep: 02/06/1928.    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
08/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930.    
21/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 26/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13)
   
10/02/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
   
01/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935.    
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 13)
   
04/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
   
08/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
23/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1939. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
   
07/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
   
13/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946.    
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1379    
15/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61379 but not taken up    
01/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    
12/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1379 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev