Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 374 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1443 Week
» 1443 Month
» 68305 Year
» 1733681 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 472 m/e 06/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5472   03/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1380   15/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61380   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/106/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1922
Withdrawal Tue 03/08/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1922
GOR   Gorton on 24/06/1922
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 05/05/1924
GOR   Gorton on 26/12/1924
ANN   Annesley on 21/07/1933
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 15/09/1946
GOR   Gorton on 16/04/1947
     Withdrawn on 03/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton on 16/04/1947
WDN GOR Gorton on 03/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 292)
31/12/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
10/08/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1929)
19/12/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1925)
24/06/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
03/03/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1930)
12/10/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
03/04/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 356)
24/09/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3012)
13/07/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 559)
08/05/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3018)
23/12/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3037)
05/04/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 03/05/1924 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5472
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1926 20/02/1926 -266 days General    
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 31/12/1927 64 days General Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1929 10/08/1929 43 days General Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 19/12/1931 36 days General Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 24/06/1933 29 days General Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1934 03/03/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 12/10/1935 22 days General Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 03/04/1937 22 days General Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 24/09/1938 29 days General Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1940 13/07/1940 22 days General Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1941 21/06/1941 57 days General Four new cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1943 08/05/1943 19 days General Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1944 23/12/1944 22 days General Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 05/04/1947 36 days General Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1948 03/08/1948 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 472
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
24/06/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5472
   
05/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
26/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1926. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
29/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
   
29/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13)
   
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
21/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13)
   
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
   
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
   
22/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
   
26/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
   
20/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13)
   
15/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1380    
01/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
16/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61380 but not taken up    
03/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1380 from Gorton (GOR)    
03/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/08/1948. Dep: 03/08/1948.    

prev prev