Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1005 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6501 Week
» 25402 Month
» 25402 Year
» 1690778 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 473 m/e 07/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5473   26/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1381   12/01/1947
British Railways (BR 1st) 61381   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61706   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/107/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal Mon 26/12/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 31/12/49 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1922
GOR Gorton on 29/07/1922
YK York (North) on 22/09/1924
GOR Gorton on 28/02/1925
NEA Neasden on 27/01/1927
IMM Immingham on 04/03/1940
LIN Lincoln on 05/07/1942
IMM Immingham on 01/11/1942
WFD Woodford Halse on 29/05/1943
GOR Gorton on 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn on 26/12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 26/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 295)
05/01/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
04/10/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 73)
19/11/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
01/12/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
11/12/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
10/12/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
21/09/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3012)
29/05/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 784)
06/09/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3050)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 26/04/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5473
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1926 04/09/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 05/01/1929 106 days General
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 02/03/1929 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1930 04/10/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 19/11/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1934 01/12/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1936 11/12/1936 21 days General
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1938 10/12/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 21/09/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1943 29/05/1943 19 days General
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1945 12/05/1945 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/03/1946 06/04/1946 15 days Light Repair
New left hand outside cylinder fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 06/09/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 473
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
29/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
28/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
04/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
01/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1381    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61381 but not taken up    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61706    
26/12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61706 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev