Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 45 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3370 Week
» 3370 Month
» 70232 Year
» 1735608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 31 m/e 07/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5031   29/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1383   02/08/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61383   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/107/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6107
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal Fri 14/05/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 25 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up I5/5/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1922
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 29/09/1922
GOR   Gorton on 10/03/1923
LIV   Brunswick on 09/02/1938
GOR   Gorton on 11/08/1940
LIV   Brunswick on 20/09/1940
ANN   Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
     Withdrawn on 14/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 14/05/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
09/08/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
20/08/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 388)
20/01/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 273)
04/04/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3010)
29/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 784)
07/09/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 576)
25/09/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3025)
26/01/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3012)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/12/1922 17/02/1923 64 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1924 29/11/1924 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5031
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1926 08/01/1927 78 days General    
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 13/10/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 09/08/1930 36 days General Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 20/08/1932 22 days General Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1933 20/01/1934 36 days General Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 04/04/1936 22 days General Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 29/01/1938 22 days General Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 07/09/1940 22 days General Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1943 25/09/1943 40 days General Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1944 21/10/1944 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 26/01/1946 36 days General Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1942 General Observations N.E. Area have revealed quite a few strange -locos. that have been seen. Two 'J.6's' were noted on a recent trip to West Hartlepool, one being 3547 in Newport yard. A 'Q.4' from Barnsley was outside the shed at WHL in addition to the usual one or two 'O.4's,' At Darlington, 'B.7' 5031 was noted on a down goods, followed by 3843, one of the new 'O.2's.' SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 31
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6107
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
16/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5031
   
23/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 08/01/1927.    
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
   
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
   
16/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13)
   
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
   
09/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
11/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
   
20/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
   
02/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1383    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61383 but not taken up    
14/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1383 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev