Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2197 Week
» 21098 Month
» 21098 Year
» 1686474 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 32 m/e 07/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5032   28/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1384   20/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61384   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/107/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6108
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal Thu 19/08/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/8/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1922
LEI Leicester (G.C.) on 29/09/1922
ANN Annesley on 19/07/1924
LEI Leicester (G.C.) on 15/11/1924
GOR Gorton on 24/02/1925
LEI Leicester (G.C.) on 08/06/1925
NEA Neasden on 07/10/1927
GOR Gorton on 22/10/1927
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 17/02/1928
GOR Gorton on 29/06/1929
ANN Annesley on 03/02/1934
GOR Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
   Withdrawn on 19/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 19/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
23/05/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1923)
20/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
10/11/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
16/05/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
31/07/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
04/03/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
12/10/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
28/03/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3033)
25/03/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
30/03/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3030)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 28/02/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5032
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 08/10/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 06/07/1929 17/08/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 23/05/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 20/05/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 10/11/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 16/05/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 31/07/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1939 04/03/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1940 12/10/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1942 28/03/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1944 25/03/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 30/03/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1948 31/01/1948 1 day Light Repair
Firehole ring fracture
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 32
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6108
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
24/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
07/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
22/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
20/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1384    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61384 but not taken up    
19/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1384 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev