Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 22 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1859 Week
» 13004 Month
» 112789 Year
» 1778165 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 32 m/e 07/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5032   28/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1384   20/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61384   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/107/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6108
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal Thu 19/08/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/8/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1922
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 29/09/1922
ANN   Annesley on 19/07/1924
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 15/11/1924
GOR   Gorton on 24/02/1925
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 08/06/1925
NEA   Neasden on 07/10/1927
GOR   Gorton on 22/10/1927
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 17/02/1928
GOR   Gorton on 29/06/1929
ANN   Annesley on 03/02/1934
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
     Withdrawn on 19/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 19/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
23/05/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1923)
20/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
10/11/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
16/05/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
31/07/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
04/03/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
12/10/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
28/03/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3033)
25/03/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
30/03/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3030)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 28/02/1925 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5032
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 08/10/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 06/07/1929 17/08/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 23/05/1931 36 days General Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 20/05/1933 22 days General Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 10/11/1934 22 days General Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 16/05/1936 22 days General Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 31/07/1937 29 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1939 04/03/1939 29 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1940 12/10/1940 22 days General Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1942 28/03/1942 36 days General Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1944 25/03/1944 31 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 30/03/1946 43 days General Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1948 31/01/1948 1 day Light Repair Firehole ring fracture
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 32
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6108
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
20/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 28/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5032
   
24/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
07/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
22/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 17/08/1929.    
18/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
   
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
   
03/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
04/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
   
21/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
   
20/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1384    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61384 but not taken up    
31/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Firehole ring fracture
   
19/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1384 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev