Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 103 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4595 Week
» 29429 Month
» 63761 Year
» 1729137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 33 m/e 08/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5033   26/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1385   01/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61385   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/108/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6109
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal Wed 12/01/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 15/1/49 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1922
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 05/08/1922
ANN   Annesley on 19/07/1924
GOR   Gorton on 08/06/1925
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 16/02/1928
GOR   Gorton on 06/05/1929
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 29/06/1929
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ANN   Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
GOR   Gorton on 16/04/1947
     Withdrawn on 12/01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton on 16/04/1947
WDN GOR Gorton on 12/01/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1933)
08/06/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 295)
06/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 66)
25/08/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 781)
27/06/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1931)
18/11/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)
11/04/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)
08/04/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3026)
24/08/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3048)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 26/09/1925 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5033
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 29/10/1927 64 days General    
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 21/03/1931 29 days General    
Gorton Works 15/04/1933 06/05/1933 22 days General Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 25/08/1934 22 days General Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1934 20/10/1934 15 days Light Repair Lubricator changed
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1936 27/06/1936 29 days General Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1937 25/09/1937 50 days General Four new cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 18/11/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1942 11/04/1942 26 days General Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 06/03/1943 51 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1944 08/04/1944 30 days General Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1946 24/08/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 33
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6109
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
05/08/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5033
   
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
16/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
   
06/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.    
15/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
   
06/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Lubricator changed
   
30/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13)
   
07/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
   
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
   
17/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
   
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 13)
   
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1385    
16/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61385 but not taken up    
12/01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1385 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev