Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 25 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2190 Week
» 2190 Month
» 69052 Year
» 1734428 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 34 m/e 08/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5034   26/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1386   30/06/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61386   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61708   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/108/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6110
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal Mon 13/06/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1922
GOR   Gorton on 25/08/1922
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 19/04/1924
GOR   Gorton on 05/05/1924
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 08/06/1925
CLK   Colwick on 30/11/1925
GOR   Gorton on 27/03/1926
CLK   Colwick on 16/03/1937
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 13/12/1937
IMM   Immingham on 17/03/1939
WFD   Woodford Halse on 03/05/1943
ANN   Annesley on 24/05/1943
WFD   Woodford Halse on 21/06/1943
ANN   Annesley on 05/07/1943
GOR   Gorton on 24/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1934)
06/12/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
05/11/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 355)
15/09/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 66)
05/09/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
10/12/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
19/10/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
14/11/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3006)
14/10/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 928)
22/03/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3021)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 07/05/1924 26/07/1924 81 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5034
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1927 15/01/1927 -280 days General    
Gorton Works 31/12/1927 11/02/1928 43 days General    
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 29/12/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 06/12/1930 43 days General Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1932 05/11/1932 29 days General Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 15/09/1934 29 days General Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 05/09/1936 22 days General Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1938 10/12/1938 29 days General Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1940 19/10/1940 29 days General Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1942 14/11/1942 46 days General Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1944 14/10/1944 27 days General Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1947 22/03/1947 43 days General Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 34
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6110
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/08/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
05/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5034
   
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
30/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1927. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
31/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.    
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 29/12/1928.    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
   
08/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13)
   
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
16/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
12/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
   
17/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
30/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
   
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1386    
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61386 but not taken up    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61708 but not taken up    
13/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1386 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev