Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 474 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2639 Week
» 2639 Month
» 69501 Year
» 1734877 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 35 m/e 08/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5035   29/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1387   08/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61387   Not applied
British Railways (BR Tmp) E1387   31/01/1948
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61709   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/108/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 02105
Works Number 6111
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal Mon 09/01/1950 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1950 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/1/50

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1922
GOR   Gorton on 01/09/1922
ANN   Annesley on 10/06/1925
GOR   Gorton on 17/04/1926
NEA   Neasden on 14/02/1929
GOR   Gorton on 23/03/1929
IMM   Immingham on 30/08/1940
LIN   Lincoln on 05/07/1942
IMM   Immingham on 01/11/1942
WFD   Woodford Halse on 03/05/1943
ANN   Annesley on 24/05/1943
WFD   Woodford Halse on 21/06/1943
ANN   Annesley on 05/07/1943
GOR   Gorton on 30/10/1943
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
     Withdrawn on 09/01/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 09/01/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1935)
29/11/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 274)
18/10/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
22/10/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
11/08/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
07/03/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 86)
18/12/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3018)
20/01/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3013)
14/03/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3030)
22/01/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
24/11/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3034)
31/01/1948 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3040)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 11/10/1924 29/11/1924 50 days General Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5035
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1927   General    
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 12/01/1929 71 days General    
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 18/01/1930 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 18/10/1930 50 days General Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1932 22/10/1932 22 days General Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 11/08/1934 29 days General Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1936 07/03/1936 22 days General Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 18/12/1937 22 days General Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1939 20/01/1940 29 days General Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1942 14/03/1942 30 days General Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1943 22/01/1944 34 days General After collision
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 24/11/1945 29 days Heavy Firebox fracture
Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/12/1947 31/01/1948 36 days General Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1387
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/03/1947 Newbury Racecourse Dump Engines stored 15th March, 1947. 'Austerity' 0-6-0 saddle tank W.D. 75092, Hudswell Clarke 1753/43; and thirty-three of the U.S.A. pattern 0 6 0 side tank: 1252/3/4/6/8/9, 1261/6 H. K. Porter & Co. 7408/9, 7410/2/4/5/7, 7422 (1942). 1279/80/82 Vulcan Iron Works, Wilkes-Barre 4377/78/80 (1942), 1387/90/93/98, 1400/3/4/7/8/11/12/25/28/29 H. K. Porter & Co. 7501/4/7/12 (1942) 7514/7/8/21/2/5/6 (? 1943) 7539/42/43 (1943), 1938/40/44 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2503/5/9 (3/1943). 1959/68/91 Vulcan Iron Wks. 4432/41/44 (2/43, 3/43, 3/43). 4372, 6006 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2521 (4/43) & 2595 (1/44). All the Vulcan lot except 1280 were marked for the Southern Ry. Although all had their original U.S.A. numbers, all except eleven (1252, 1390/3/8, 1400/4/11/29, 1944/68, 4372) carried W.D. prefix. The dates were not shown on the Porter engines. (With regard to the numbering, two of this class when at Longmoor were given numbers in the W.D. series, 75215 (1954) and 75217 (1958) for a short time only). SLS/194705

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 35
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6111
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
01/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5035
   
10/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 05/02/1927.    
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929.    
14/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
23/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 18/01/1930.    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
   
01/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
15/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
   
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
   
23/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 13)
   
30/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
   
05/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
01/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Firebox fracture
Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13)
   
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1387    
27/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1387
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61387 but not taken up    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61709    
01/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    
09/01/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61709 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev