Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 956 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2128 Week
» 21029 Month
» 21029 Year
» 1686405 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 475C on 11/08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5475   12/12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1388   19/12/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61388   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61710   14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 11/08/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 20/02/1950 off Gorton (39A)
Scrapping During 04/1950 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 26 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/2/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 11/08/1923
NEA Neasden on 11/08/1923
GOR Gorton on 10/12/1925
DON Doncaster on 25/03/1934
GOR Gorton on 08/09/1934
LIN Lincoln on 09/10/1935
GOR Gorton on 05/11/1935
IMM Immingham on 30/08/1940
GOR Gorton on 24/10/1943
91M To London Midland Region (on loan) on 12/06/1949
GOR Gorton on 24/06/1949
   Withdrawn on 20/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 12/06/1949
EXLOAN GOR Gorton on 24/06/1949
WDN 39A Gorton on 20/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/08/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 499)
30/11/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 406)
13/02/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 273)
06/01/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
31/08/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)
22/05/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
12/07/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3028)
19/06/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 559)
22/09/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3020)
22/11/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3022)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/09/1925 12/12/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5475
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1927 05/11/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 30/11/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 13/02/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 06/01/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 31/08/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1937 22/05/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1938 05/02/1938 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 18/03/1939 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/06/1941 12/07/1941 34 days General
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1943 19/06/1943 26 days General
Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1944 05/08/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 22/09/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1947 22/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/08/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
11/08/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 475
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
10/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
05/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1388    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61388 but not taken up    
14/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61710    
12/06/1949 Allocation Loaned to To London Midland Region (91M)    
24/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61710 from Gorton (39A)    

prev prev