|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/09/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5476 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1929 | 05/10/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 22/06/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1935 | 23/11/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 22 days | General | After collision Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/08/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 476 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
05/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5476 |
||
01/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. | ||
17/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. | ||
10/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
08/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/06/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. | ||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. Work undertaken: After collision Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. | ||
19/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3042 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1389 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61389 but not taken up | ||
04/02/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1389 from Gorton (GOR) |