Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 910 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 910 Week
» 19811 Month
» 19811 Year
» 1685187 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 477C on 22/09/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5477   21/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1390   22/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61390   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 22/09/1923 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Tue 02/11/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 6/11/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 22/09/1923
NEA Neasden on 28/06/1924
IMM Immingham on 19/11/1925
GOR Gorton on 27/06/1927
IMM Immingham on 05/01/1936
LIN Lincoln on 05/07/1942
IMM Immingham on 09/08/1942
WFD Woodford Halse on 03/05/1943
ANN Annesley on 24/05/1943
WFD Woodford Halse on 21/06/1943
ANN Annesley on 05/07/1943
GOR Gorton on 24/10/1943
   Withdrawn on 02/11/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 02/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/09/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
22/12/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1927)
29/10/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
14/07/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 763)
19/10/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 345)
22/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3013)
25/11/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3029)
03/05/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 45)
02/10/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 576)
28/04/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3018)
28/12/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3036)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 21/11/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5477
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 15/10/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 22/12/1928 92 days General
Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1930 23/08/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/10/1932 29/10/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 14/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1935 19/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 08/08/1936 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/12/1937 22/01/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 25/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 03/05/1941 29 days Heavy
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1943 02/10/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1945 28/04/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 28/12/1946 29 days Heavy
One right hand cylinder replaced
Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/09/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 477
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
28/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
09/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1390    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61390 but not taken up    
02/11/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1390 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev