Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 919 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 919 Week
» 19820 Month
» 19820 Year
» 1685196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 479C on 03/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5479   14/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1392   02/11/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61392   Not applied
British Railways (BR 2nd) 61712   14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 03/11/1923 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 13/06/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 03/11/1923
LIN Lincoln on 07/09/1935
WFD Woodford Halse on 07/02/1936
GOR Gorton on 07/11/1942
ANN Annesley on 07/05/1943
GOR Gorton on 07/10/1943
   Withdrawn on 13/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 01/05/1949
EXLOAN GOR Gorton on 08/05/1949
WDN GOR Gorton on 13/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/11/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
12/10/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1712)
14/11/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1930)
09/12/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 6)
14/09/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 8)
09/01/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
17/09/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)
10/08/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
28/11/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
18/11/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3036)
07/12/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3041)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/08/1925 14/11/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5479
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 24/12/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 31/08/1929 12/10/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1931 14/11/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 23/01/1932 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 09/12/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 14/09/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1936 09/01/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1938 17/09/1938 43 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1940 10/08/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1942 28/11/1942 38 days General
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1944 18/11/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1946 07/12/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 479
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
07/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
07/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1392    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61392 but not taken up    
14/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61712    
13/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61712 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev