|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/08/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5479 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1929 | 12/10/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 23/01/1932 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1935 | 14/09/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1936 | 09/01/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 479 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
29/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5479 |
||
29/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. | ||
31/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 12/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 23/01/1932. | ||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
07/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 09/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1392 | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61392 but not taken up | ||
14/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61712 | ||
13/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61712 from Gorton (GOR) |