Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1027 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2199 Week
» 21100 Month
» 21100 Year
» 1686476 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5481 on 08/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1394   21/09/1946
British Railways (BR 1st) 61394   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 08/12/1923 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Thu 22/04/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 24 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/4/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) on 08/12/1923
NEA Neasden on 28/10/1927
WFD Woodford Halse on 14/01/1928
NEA Neasden on 17/12/1929
WFD Woodford Halse on 15/03/1930
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 07/03/1938
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ANN Annesley on 03/05/1943
GOR Gorton on 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn on 22/04/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton on 22/04/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/12/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 345)
07/11/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
08/04/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
06/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 355)
04/07/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3011)
27/11/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
26/11/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
12/12/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3041)
19/02/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3030)
16/02/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3025)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/09/1925 05/12/1925 85 days General  
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 15/10/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 27/07/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 07/11/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1931 13/02/1932 50 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 08/04/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 06/10/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 04/07/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1937 27/11/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 26/11/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1940 21/12/1940 29 days General  
Gorton Works 12/11/1942 12/12/1942 31 days General
Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1944 19/02/1944 38 days General
New right hand outside cylinder fitted after collision
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1946 16/02/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/12/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 5481
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
28/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
14/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
17/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
15/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1394    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61394 but not taken up    
22/04/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1394 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev