Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1010 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1010 Week
» 19911 Month
» 19911 Year
» 1685287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 439 m/e 07/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 439C   after 03/03/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5439   31/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1332   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1350   08/12/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1914 SUTTON NELTHORPE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B807/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1914
Withdrawal Thu 14/08/1947 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1914
GOR Gorton on 29/09/1922
CLK Colwick on 29/03/1926
ANN Annesley on 10/08/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 14/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 14/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 299)
30/12/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1550)
06/10/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 305)
28/04/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 86)
22/02/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 388)
11/12/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 928)
10/02/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3018)
27/03/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3008)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/11/1922 30/12/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1550 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1925 31/10/1925 134 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5439
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1928 06/10/1928 113 days General
Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1930 26/04/1930 50 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 13/02/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 28/04/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1936 22/02/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1936 26/09/1936 57 days General
Main frame cracked
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1937 11/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 10/02/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1943 27/03/1943 24 days General
Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1945 04/08/1945 43 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 439, name: SUTTON NELTHORPE
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/03/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 439C    
29/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1332 but not taken up    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1350    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
14/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1350 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev