Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2233 Week
» 21134 Month
» 21134 Year
» 1686510 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 440 m/e 08/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5440   04/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1333   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1351   15/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B808/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1914
Withdrawal Thu 23/10/1947 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/10/47

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1914
ANN Annesley on 17/02/1922
LEI Leicester (G.C.) on 19/07/1924
ANN Annesley on 14/11/1924
MAR March on 25/07/1925
GOR Gorton on 21/05/1926
CLK Colwick on 12/10/1927
ANN Annesley on 04/01/1933
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 23/10/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 23/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 303)
04/07/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 299)
17/10/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 626)
04/11/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 583)
05/06/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)
30/09/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)
15/11/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
27/11/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 583)
01/09/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/03/1922 03/06/1922 71 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1925 04/07/1925 99 days General
Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5440
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1926 26/02/1927 78 days General  
Gorton Works 08/06/1929 20/07/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/08/1931 17/10/1931 57 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 04/11/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1935 21/09/1935 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 05/06/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1938 26/03/1938 29 days Light Repair
Cracked frame
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1939 30/09/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 30/03/1940 36 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1941 15/11/1941 31 days General
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1943 27/11/1943 27 days General
Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 01/09/1945 64 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 440
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
17/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
14/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1333 but not taken up    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1351    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
23/10/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1351 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev