Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 270 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5881 Week
» 16927 Month
» 16927 Year
» 1682303 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 442 m/e 09/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5442   15/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1335   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1353   09/11/1946
British Railways 61353   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B809/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1914
Withdrawal Thu 24/03/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 34 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1914
GOR Gorton on 27/11/1922
MAR March on 10/10/1924
GOR Gorton on 22/05/1926
CLK Colwick on 09/07/1926
ANN Annesley on 15/10/1928
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 24/03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 24/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 309)
08/10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1548)
06/02/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 599)
12/05/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1546)
25/06/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1549)
13/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
25/04/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
18/12/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3011)
10/03/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 928)
01/08/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
04/11/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3006)
09/11/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/09/1921 08/01/1921 -251 days General  
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 15/03/1924 71 days General
New cylinders fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5442
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 06/02/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 12/05/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1930 03/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 28/05/1932 25/06/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1933 25/02/1933 15 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 13/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1936 25/04/1936 29 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 18/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1940 10/03/1940 23 days General
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1942 01/08/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1943 25/09/1943 11 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1944 04/11/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1946 09/11/1946 57 days General
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1353
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 442
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
08/10/1921 Modification Diagram 13 number 1548 boiler fitted    
27/11/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/07/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1335 but not taken up    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61353 but not taken up    
24/03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1353 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev