Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 947 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6558 Week
» 17604 Month
» 17604 Year
» 1682980 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 443 m/e 10/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5443   10/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1336   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1354   10/11/1946
British Railways 61354   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B810/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1914
Withdrawal Mon 15/03/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1914
GOR Gorton on 24/02/1922
MAR March on 03/11/1923
GOR Gorton on 13/10/1924
ANN Annesley on 24/01/1925
CLK Colwick on 27/03/1926
ANN Annesley on 09/08/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 15/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 15/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 401)
17/02/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 397)
11/06/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1712)
14/09/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 300)
30/09/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 8)
13/07/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1921)
22/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)
18/05/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
19/09/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3039)
04/03/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)
12/01/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/07/1920 02/10/1920 64 days General  
Gorton Works 13/01/1923 17/02/1923 36 days General
Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1924 10/01/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5443
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 11/06/1927 64 days General
Rebuilt to class B8/2
Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 14/09/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1931 21/11/1931 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 30/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 13/07/1935 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B8/1
Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1936 29/02/1936 29 days Heavy
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1938 22/01/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 18/05/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1942 19/09/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 3039 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1944 04/03/1944 53 days General
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 12/01/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 443
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/11/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
27/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1336 but not taken up    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1354    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61354 but not taken up    
15/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1354 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev