Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 281 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5892 Week
» 16938 Month
» 16938 Year
» 1682314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 444 m/e 10/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1923 Int) 444C   25/08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5444   10/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1337   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1355   18/08/1946
British Railways 61355   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B810/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1914
Withdrawal Thu 02/09/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping During 09/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 4/9/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1914
GOR Gorton on 24/02/1922
MAR March on 03/11/1923
GOR Gorton on 13/10/1924
MAR March on 08/06/1925
GOR Gorton on 16/06/1926
CLK Colwick on 16/06/1927
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1927
CLK Colwick on 02/04/1928
ANN Annesley on 15/06/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 02/09/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall on 02/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 406)
04/08/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1549)
09/04/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1547)
19/01/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 599)
29/07/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1925)
17/08/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)
08/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
20/04/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3022)
20/02/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3011)
07/07/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3023)
19/04/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3049)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/12/1920 05/02/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 19/05/1923 04/08/1923 78 days General
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1924 10/01/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5444
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 09/04/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 1547 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1928 19/01/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 21/02/1931 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 29/07/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 17/08/1935 29 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1937 08/01/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1940 20/04/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1943 20/02/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1943 20/11/1943 17 days Light Repair
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1945 07/07/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 19/04/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 444
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
24/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/08/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 444C    
03/11/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
16/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1337 but not taken up    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1355    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61355 but not taken up    
02/09/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1355 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev