|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neasden | 12/09/1921 | 15/10/1921 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1923 | 10/03/1923 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1924 | 06/12/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5446 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1929 | 24/08/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1933 | 11/11/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 29 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1942 | 23/01/1943 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 446, name: EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
12/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Neasden (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921. | ||
03/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
27/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1923. Dep: 10/03/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/11/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1924. Dep: 06/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5446 |
||
06/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
08/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
06/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
09/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. | ||
20/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. | ||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. | ||
13/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1339 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1357 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61357 but not taken up | ||
23/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1357 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |