|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/01/1922 | 25/02/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1924 | 19/07/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5280 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1926 | 12/03/1927 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1934 | 10/02/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1935 | 25/01/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 36 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | Firehole ring fracture |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 280 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
07/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1922. Dep: 25/02/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/12/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5280 |
||
04/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
31/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
31/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
02/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
17/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. | ||
18/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13) |
||
28/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
08/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1341 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Firehole ring fracture |
||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1359 | ||
25/03/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1359 from Annesley (ANN) |