Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1049 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2221 Week
» 21122 Month
» 21122 Year
» 1686498 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1105 m/e 09/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6105   15/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1342   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1469   03/11/1946
British Railways 61469   12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B909/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4806
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal Sat 02/04/1949 off Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1906
LIN Lincoln m/e 05/1919
GOR Gorton on 08/10/1925
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 24/11/1927
GOR Gorton on 19/03/1930
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 04/06/1930
GOR Gorton on 30/05/1932
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 04/03/1933
GOR Gorton on 13/07/1934
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 17/03/1937
GOR Gorton on 05/08/1938
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 30/09/1938
19D Heaton Mersey on 11/10/1941
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 22/04/1945
19D Heaton Mersey on 06/05/1945
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 19G Trafford Park (LMS) on 02/04/1949
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 14/06/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) on 13/09/1959
WDN   on 18/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1215)
12/08/1916 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1222)
06/08/1921 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1176)
27/08/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)
09/07/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
08/12/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)
28/11/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
24/09/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 897)
26/07/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
20/11/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
27/07/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3727)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/01/1916 12/08/1916 225 days General
Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1920 06/08/1921 246 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1923 23/06/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1925 15/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6105
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 27/08/1927 120 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 17/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 09/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1934 08/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1936 28/11/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 24/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1939 22/04/1939 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/07/1941 26/07/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1943 20/11/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1946 27/07/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1949 02/04/1949 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1105
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4806
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
05/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
08/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
19/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
30/05/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
13/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
05/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
11/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
22/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1342 but not taken up    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1469    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61469    
02/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61469 from Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)    

prev