|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/01/1916 | 12/08/1916 | 225 days | General | Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1920 | 06/08/1921 | 246 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1923 | 23/06/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6105 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 120 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 24/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1105 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4806 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
01/01/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1916. Dep: 12/08/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9) |
||
05/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
04/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1920. Dep: 06/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram GC9) |
||
14/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. | ||
23/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6105 |
||
08/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
19/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
04/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
30/05/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
04/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
13/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
05/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
08/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. | ||
07/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
30/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
06/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1342 but not taken up | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1469 | ||
12/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61469 | ||
02/04/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61469 from Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) | ||
02/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. |