Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 858 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6354 Week
» 25255 Month
» 25255 Year
» 1690631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1106 m/e 09/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6106   03/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1343   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1470   16/11/1946
British Railways 61470   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B909/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4807
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal Fri 19/11/1948 off Brunswick (LIV)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 20/11/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1906
GOR Gorton on 19/08/1921
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 07/06/1926
GOR Gorton on 08/08/1928
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 27/08/1928
GOR Gorton on 04/06/1930
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 09/09/1930
GOR Gorton on 29/08/1932
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 27/10/1932
GOR Gorton on 11/10/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 17/06/1935
GOR Gorton on 19/01/1937
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/10/1937
GOR Gorton on 27/09/1939
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 06/04/1941
GOR Gorton on 21/09/1941
LIV Brunswick on 11/03/1945
   Withdrawn on 19/11/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIV Brunswick on 19/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1216)
07/10/1911 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1224)
05/06/1920 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1207)
29/03/1924 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1212)
23/01/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 646)
08/10/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
20/04/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 601)
26/06/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
02/12/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)
22/08/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
30/03/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 838)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/08/1911 07/10/1911 50 days General
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1920 05/06/1920 50 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1922 29/04/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 29/03/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1925 23/01/1926 120 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 21/04/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 26/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/09/1932 08/10/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1933 18/11/1933 29 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1935 20/04/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 26/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 02/12/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1942 22/08/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1943 29/01/1944 33 days Heavy
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1944 09/12/1944 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 30/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 31/08/1946 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1947 15/03/1947 22 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1106
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4807
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
19/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6106    
07/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
08/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
04/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
29/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
11/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
19/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
27/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
21/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1343 but not taken up    
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1470    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61470 but not taken up    
19/11/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1470 from Brunswick (LIV)    

prev prev