Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 952 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 19853 Month
» 19853 Year
» 1685229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1110 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6110   26/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1347   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1474   24/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B910/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4811
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Tue 07/10/1947 off Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/10/47

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
GOR Gorton on 19/08/1921
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) m/e 01/1929
GOR Gorton on 15/04/1929
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/08/1929
GOR Gorton on 06/01/1932
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 30/04/1932
GOR Gorton on 03/11/1932
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 23/03/1934
GOR Gorton on 01/04/1936
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 27/09/1939
GOR Gorton on 21/09/1941
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 22/03/1942
   Withdrawn on 07/10/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 07/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1220)
20/09/1913 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1218)
17/01/1920 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1827)
26/04/1924 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1207)
14/08/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
13/02/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 419)
03/03/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
29/10/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
21/02/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 852)
17/06/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/08/1913 20/09/1913 36 days General
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1919 17/01/1920 225 days General
New left hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 1827 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1922 01/07/1922 85 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 26/04/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram GC9)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6110
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1926 14/08/1926 176 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 01/06/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 30/01/1932 13/02/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1934 03/03/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 18/07/1936 22 days General  
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 29/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1939 02/09/1939 1 day Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1942 21/02/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1944 17/06/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1110
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4811
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
19/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
15/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
03/11/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
01/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
21/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1347 but not taken up    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1474    
07/10/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1474 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    

prev prev